Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00437
Date Filed2022-02-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning communications between listed employees of the Office of the Solicitor and Tommy Beaudreau or members of his law firm. PPT also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PPT's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-02-171COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9051893) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA DOI-SOL-2021-004073, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Department of the Interior Solicitor)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 02/17/2022)
2022-02-22Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 02/25/2022)
2022-03-103NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/10/2022)
2022-04-044ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 04/04/2022)
2022-04-085STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 8, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-05-046Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file another Joint Status Report on this matter on June 4, 2022, and every 30 days thereafter until production in this matter is finished. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 18, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-06-037Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-07-058Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the next Joint Status Report be filed in this matter on September 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 19, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-09-029Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the next Joint Status Report be filed in this matter on November 4, 2022, and every sixty days thereafter until this matter is resolved. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 2, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/4/2022. (zkh) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-11-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar