Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKoffa v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2022cv00179
Date Filed2022-02-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lauren King
PlaintiffBennie Sayee Koffa
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantTuella O Sykes Attorney
DefendantHousing Navigation Division
a division of Compass Housing Agency
DefendantAllied Universal Services Corporation
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [9]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-02-161MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Bennie S Koffa. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED Complaint, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel)(ST) Modified on 2/17/2022 to label complaint as "Proposed" (KB). (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-16Case assigned to Hon. Lauren King. (ST) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-163Notice of Filing Deficiency re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (cc: plaintiff w/summons form via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-174ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The undersigned recommends review by the assigned District Judge under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e)(2)(B). Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan.(MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (Entered: 02/17/2022)
2022-02-175COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Allied Universal Services Corporation, Housing Navigation Division, Tuella O Sykes, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Bennie Sayee Koffa.(MW) (Entered: 02/17/2022)
2022-02-176MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Bennie Sayee Koffa. Noted by Clerk for 3/4/2022(MW) (Entered: 02/17/2022)
2022-03-117Proposed Summons; filed by Plaintiff Bennie Sayee Koffa. (MW) (Entered: 03/11/2022)
2022-03-168Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Allied Universal Services Corporation, Housing Navigation Division, Tuella O Sykes, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (MW) (Issued summons mailed to Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-06-069ORDER Dismissing Complaint Without Prejudice and Denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court DISMISSES Mr. Koffa's complaint without prejudice and with leave to amend within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Lauren King.(MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar