Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLandingham v. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityCleveland
Case Number1:2022cv00284
Date Filed2022-02-18
Date Closed2022-04-27
JudgeJudge Pamela A. Barker
PlaintiffMichael Landingham
DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-02-181Complaint with jury demand against Department of Justice. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Michael D. Landingham. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 USM-285 Form, # 4 Various Reports and Documents). (V,AR) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-182Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael D. Landingham. (V,AR) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-18Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (V,AR) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-18Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (V,AR) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-04-273Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in this Order, this action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e). Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. (Doc No. 2.) Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/27/2022. (P,K) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-274Order of Case Dismissal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/27/2022. (P,K) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-27Copy of 3 Memorandum Opinion and Order and 4 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Michael Landingham at 4311 Bucyrus Avenue Cleveland, OH 44109 on 4/27/2022. (P,K) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar