Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-03-17 | 1 | Complaint against USCIS ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8297947.), filed by Shirley Borromeo. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Request 2014, # 3 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgment Letter 2014, # 4 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter 2014, # 5 Exhibit FOIA Record Documents 2014, # 6 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Letter 2014, # 7 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Acknowledgment Letter 2014, # 8 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Decision Letter 2014, # 9 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Documents, # 10 Exhibit FOIA Request Mother 2018, # 11 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgment Letter Mother 2018, # 12 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter Mother 2019, # 13 Exhibit FOIA Record Documents Mother 2019, # 14 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Letter Mother 2019, # 15 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Acknowledgment Letter 2019, # 16 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Decision Letter 2019, # 17 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgment Letter 2021, # 18 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter 2021, # 19 Exhibit FOIA Record Documents 2021, # 20 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Letter 2021, # 21 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Acknowledgment Letter 2021, # 22 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Response Letter 2021, # 23 Exhibit FOIA Record Documents 2021, # 24 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgment Letter Mother Mother 2021, # 25 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter Mother 2021, # 26 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Letter Mother 2021, # 27 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter Mother 2022)(Tousley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/17/2022) |
2022-03-17 | 2 | Proposed Summons DHS, USCIS, USA, AG by Shirley Borromeo. (Tousley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/17/2022) |
2022-03-18 | 3 | Summons Issued as to UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons Notice)(swil) (Entered: 03/18/2022) |
2022-04-04 | 4 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shirley Borromeo. All Defendants. (Tousley, Thomas) (Entered: 04/04/2022) |
2022-04-07 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2022) |
2022-04-07 | 6 | ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before April 25, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 04/07/2022. (wgar, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022) |
2022-04-25 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Peter B. Baumhart on behalf of UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS (Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 04/25/2022) |
2022-04-25 | 8 | MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 04/25/2022) |
2022-04-25 | 9 | Memorandum in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 04/25/2022) |
2022-04-25 | 10 | Waiver of re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Waiver of Hearing by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS (Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 04/25/2022) |
2022-05-09 | 11 | Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Shirley Borromeo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attorney General's FOIA Guidelines)(Tousley, Thomas) (Entered: 05/09/2022) |
2022-05-16 | 12 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 05/16/2022) |
2023-02-27 | 13 | MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss (8) is GRANTED (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 2/27/2023. (Dest) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 14 | ANSWER to Complaint by Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 15 | Joint MOTION for Production Schedule by Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |
|