Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00696
Date Filed2022-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJournalist Jimmy Tobias submitted nine FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records concerning appointment calendars for various Biden agency appointees. The agency acknowledged the receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9101929) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7-12, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-142NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-14Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-143NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-174SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2022: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zjf). (Entered: 03/17/2022)
2022-05-025NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-026ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-177ORDER: Meet & Confer Statement due by 6/2/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/17/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar