Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMALIK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00698
Date Filed2022-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffADAM MALIK
Case DescriptionAdam Malik submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the FBI, and the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning the seizure of his Iphone at DFW Airport on January 3, 2021. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Malik also submitted a request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning its manuals and guidance for seizing of materials. The agency acknowledged that request but withheld large portions of manuals under Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Other agencies withheld records as well. Malik eventually filed suit against all the agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantALEJANDRO MAYORKAS SECRETARY OF US DHS
DefendantCHRIS MAGNUS COMMISSIONER OF THE U.S. CBP
DefendantUR MENDOZA JADDOU DIRECTOR OF THE USCIS
DefendantTAE JOHNSON ACTING DIRECTOR US ICE
DefendantDAVID FERRIERO ARCHIVIST OF THE UNITED STATES
DefendantCHRISTOPHER WRAY DIRECTOR OF THE FBI
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-141COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9102082) filed by ADAM MALIK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-142REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ADAM MALIK.(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-15Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-03-15NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to blerim@elmazilaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-03-153REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ADAM MALIK.(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-03-164ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (14) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) Modified on 3/24/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-16NOTICE OF ERROR re 3 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to blerim@elmazilaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. Please use the FOIA summons at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/Summons-FOIA_2013_FILL.pdf (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 3/21/2022; DAVID FERRIERO served on 3/18/2022; UR MENDOZA JADDOU served on 3/22/2022; TAE JOHNSON served on 3/22/2022; CHRIS MAGNUS served on 3/24/2022; ADAM MALIK served on 3/24/2022; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 3/21/2022; NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 3/18/2022; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 3/22/2022; U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 3/21/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/22/2022; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/22/2022; CHRISTOPHER WRAY served on 3/21/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Elmazi, Blerim) (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-05-046Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-05MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time For Filing Answer, Nunc Pro Tunc . Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/5/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-237ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DAVID FERRIERO, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, TAE JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHRISTOPHER WRAY.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar