Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCULHANE MEADOWS, PLLC v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00704
Date Filed2022-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCULHANE MEADOWS, PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Culhane Meadows, PLLC submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Postal Service for records concerning ethical conduct communications and instructions between the USPS Ethical Conduct Officer and USPS official Douglas Veatch. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 17 pages but withheld portions under Exemption 5 (privileges). Culhane Meadows filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld its original decision. Culhane Meadows then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9102861) filed by CULHANE MEADOWS PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA request, # 2 Exhibit USPS response to FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit Administrative appeal, # 4 Exhibit USPS denial of administrative appeal, # 5 Summons Summons - US Attorney for DC, # 6 Summons Summons - USPS General Counsel, # 7 Summons Summons - Attorney General, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendel, David) (Attachment 8 replaced on 3/22/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CULHANE MEADOWS PLLC (Hendel, David) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-15NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Civil Cover Sheet; emailed to dhendel@cm.law, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 2. Please share this information with anyone in your office that assists in electronically filing documents in this Court. For more detailed case opening instructions, please visit the court's website., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-03-153CIVIL COVER SHEET CORRECTED by CULHANE MEADOWS, PLLC re 1 Complaint, filed by CULHANE MEADOWS, PLLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CULHANE MEADOWS, PLLC.(Hendel, David) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-03-16Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmg) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-164SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-175STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/17/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 03/17/2022)
2022-04-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/30/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/29/2022. (Hendel, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-287NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of U.S. POSTAL SERVICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-288Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion for extension of time, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before May 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/29/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar