Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00730
Date Filed2022-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning data and studies submitted by Pfizer and BioNTech to the FDA, including but not limited to BARDA, relating to booster vaccinations for SARS-Cov2 virus. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Judicial Watch it was invoking a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-9108577) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-17Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 03/17/2022)
2022-03-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2022: # 1 Notice and Consent) (ztth). (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-04-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/30/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/29/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/30/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/29/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-297NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-298ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-29MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before May 13, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/29/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-139Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/13/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar