Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00733
Date Filed2022-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning submissions from Pfizer and BioNTech for the SARS-CoV-2 vaccine known as Comirnaty. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9108649) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-17ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to lburke@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) Modified on 3/17/2022 (znmg). (Entered: 03/17/2022)
2022-03-17NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Notice of QC- New Case was entered in error. Please disregard. (znmg) (Entered: 03/17/2022)
2022-03-17Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmg) (Entered: 03/17/2022)
2022-03-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2022: # 1 Notice and Consent) (ztth). (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-04-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/30/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/29/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/30/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/29/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-297NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-298ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/3/2022. (lctjk3) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar