Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00734
Date Filed2022-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between Special Counsel John Durham and Attorney General Merrick Garland. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9108658) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-18Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-244STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 24, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-04-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/30/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/29/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/30/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/30/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-298NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Humphreys on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Humphreys, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-299ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Humphreys, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-03MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 27, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's requests can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 3, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/27/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar