Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00735
Date Filed2022-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning a virtual meeting pertaining to threats to election officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency referred the request to the FBI and the Office of Information Policy. The agency also told Judicial Watch that its request qualified as unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9108669) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-18Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-234STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 23, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-04-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/30/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/30/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-05-188NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-189ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-18MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before June 15, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 18, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar