Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00736
Date Filed2022-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the number of applications for a National Security Exemption to any COVID-19 related travel restrictions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Judicial Watch that it was invoking a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9108686) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-17Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 03/17/2022)
2022-03-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-04-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/30/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/29/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/30/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/30/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-297ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-29MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 6/13/22. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/29/22. (DJS) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2022. (tb) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar