Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00757
Date Filed2022-03-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning waivers or policy exemption Biden administration appointees from its ethics pledge. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-181COMPLAINT against PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST United States Department of Transportation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9113075) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 2021-281, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Department of Transportation General Counsel)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmh) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-222SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-05-023ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-15MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before May 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/15/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar