Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00759
Date Filed2022-03-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionGunowners of America and the Gun Owners Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning whether President Biden had consulted with the Congress before banning the importation of firearms and ammunition manufactured in Russia. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gunowners of America and Gun Owners Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Filing Fee $402.00 receipt number: ADCDC-9113162) filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA to DOS, # 2 Exhibit DOS Response, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 3/18/2022 to add filing fee receipt number (znmg). (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-183LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-03-234SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjf) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-04-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/28/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/27/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/28/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/28/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery on Attorney General, # 2 Exhibit Delivery on Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Exhibit Delivery on Department of State)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-07ENTERED IN ERROR AS A CLERICAL OVERSIGHT.....NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 5 Summons Returned Executed. The following error(s) need correction: Other- File an ERRATA with Proof of Service and link to DE#5. Proof of delivery is required. (zjf) Modified on 4/7/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-116NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jeffrey Olson on behalf of GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-287NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-288ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-05-119ORDER: Vaughn Index due by 06/10/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar