Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00762
Date Filed2022-03-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning ICE's communications and contracts with ShadowDragon and ICE's use of SocialNet. EPIC also requested inclusion in the news media fee category, a fee waiver, and expedited processing. EPIC heard nothing further from ICE concerning this request. EPIC also submitted a second request on ICE's use of Babel Street. EPIC also requested inclusion in the news media fee category and expedited processing. EPIC did not hear anything further from the agency on this request as well. EPIC then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-181COMPLAINT against IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9114136) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General of the United States, # 3 Summons Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-03-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-03-224ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/22/2022. (DM) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-315NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Davisson on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Davisson, John) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/31/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/30/2022. (Davisson, John) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/30/22. (Davisson, John) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-318RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/24/2022 (Davisson, John) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-05-029NOTICE of Appearance by Antonia Marie Konkoly on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-0210ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-0211ORDER. Joint status report due June 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 2, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 6/6/2022. (dot) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-06-0612Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report. As proposed therein, the parties shall file another joint status report updating the Court on the status of Defendant's productions on or before August 5, 2022 and, if necessary, every ninety days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 6, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar