Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDELLA ROCCA v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00786
Date Filed2022-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffBRIAN R. DELLA ROCCA
PlaintiffLawrence W. Doyle
PlaintiffJohn F Moynihan
Case DescriptionBrian Della Rocca submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Postal Service for records concerning cargo information relating to specifically identified contracts during a specifically identified period of time. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Della Rocca that his request was too broad. Della Rocca explained to the agency why he worded his request the way he did but did not narrow the scope of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Della Rocca filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9120224) filed by BRIAN R. DELL ROCCA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Della Rocca, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-25Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmh) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-253STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 25, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-04-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 4/4/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Della Rocca, Brian) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-22NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to bdellarocca@compass-law.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed , 2. Please file Return of Service event for US Attorney General. (zeg, ) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-295NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-296MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-297Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by BRIAN R. DELLA ROCCA. (Della Rocca, Brian) Modified docket event/text on 5/2/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before June 1, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 29, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-108AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE filed by BRIAN R. DELLA ROCCA, Lawrence W. Doyle, John F Moynihan.(Della Rocca, Brian) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar