Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00790
Date Filed2022-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed, Inc submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning emails and text messages sent to Gregg Johnstone, Special Countermeasures Section Chief regarding the report from the JASON science advisory group report on injuries sustained by U.S. diplomatic personnel in Cuba in 2016 and 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt and gave BuzzFeed an estimated date of completion. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9120651) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-223NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-224NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-25Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmh) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-255SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-286ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/28/2022. (DM) (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-04-247NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 04/24/2022)
2022-05-068AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-5)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-209ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-2010ORDER. Joint status report due on or before June 24, 2022 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 20, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar