Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCORE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00796
Date Filed2022-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffBRENDA J. CORE
Case DescriptionBrenda Core submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning specifically identified actions related to the agency's medical actions pertaining to herself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency then told her that it had granted her request in full. Since she had received no records, Core filed an administrative appeal. The agency remanded her request for further processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Core filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9123152) filed by BRENDA J. CORE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-232AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR filed by BRENDA J. CORE.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-25Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmw) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-254STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/25/22. (lctnm2) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-04-155NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-256Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-25MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond by May 31, 2022 to the 2 Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/25/22. (lctnm2) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/31/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar