Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00799
Date Filed2022-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning meetings by Senior Advisor Jesse Young in the performance of his work for the SECC. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told PPT that its request was put in the complex queue for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-231COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9122949) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA F-2022-00645, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons -- Department of State)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-25Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmw) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-05-163NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-164ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-17MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by May 31, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/17/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/31/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar