Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00801
Date Filed2022-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Professionals for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records showing that rebuilding the Safer Choices program would be a cost-effective investment of staff resources. PEER also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PEER's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-231COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9123306) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for EPA, # 3 Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons for US Att DC)(Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-25Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmh) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-05-044NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-045ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by May 18, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/4/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/18/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-186Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-18MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Joint 6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed briefing schedule by June 17, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/18/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar