Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00802
Date Filed2022-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionGunowners of America and Gun Owners Foundation submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning the agency's investigation of a Palmetto State Armory AR-15 lower receiver LETSGO-15." After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gunowners of America and Gun Owners Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9123376) filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA to Secret Service, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Gun Owners Foundation 26.1)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-24Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (znmg) (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-03-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-04-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/28/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/27/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE served on 3/28/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/28/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery on Civil Process Clerk, # 2 Exhibit Delivery on Secret Service, # 3 Exhibit Delivery on Attorney General)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-115NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jeffrey Olson on behalf of GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-216AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA to Secret Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-05-057NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-198Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 6 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-199ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 defendant's consent motion for enlargement of time pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(B), and the entire record herein, the motion is hereby GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that 9 defendant's answer, filed on this date, shall be considered timely. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/19/2022. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-1910ORDER regarding scheduling. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/19/2022. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/10/2022. (tb) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar