Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C. v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00827
Date Filed2022-03-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffBEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Beverage & Diamond submitted two FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning the factors or criteria used to identify the 25 high priority sites that are the subject of an Office of Inspector General report. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency provided some records but after being dissatisfied with the agency's response, Beverage & Diamond filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
1200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20460
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-251COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-9129429) filed by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gannon, Collin) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-30Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zmh) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-03-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-03-303STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 3/30/2022. (lcsw) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-04-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/05/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Proof of Service)(Gannon, Collin) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Proof of Service)(Gannon, Collin) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 4/4/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Proof of Service)(Gannon, Collin) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-257AMENDED COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY filed by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 2021-06-25 EO High Priority List FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 2021-07-30 FOIA Request Region 6, # 3 Exhibit 3 Appeal of FOIA Request No. EPA-R6-2021-005139, # 4 Summons EPA, # 5 Summons US Attorney for D.C., # 6 Summons US Attorney General)(Gannon, Collin) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-278NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-059MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel B. Schulson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9218472. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel B. Schulson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Collin) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-06MINUTE ORDER granting 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Daniel B. Schulson is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff Beveridge & Diamond, P.C. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/6/2022. (lcsw) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-0610Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-09MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the 1 Complaint is due on May 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/9/2022. (lcsw) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/24/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-1111NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Schulson on behalf of BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C. (Schulson, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-2412Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar