Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMoore Injury Law, LLC et al v. United States Department of Labor
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2022cv01128
Date Filed2022-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark H. Cohen
PlaintiffMoore Injury Law, LLC
PlaintiffKevin G. Moore
Case DescriptionMoore Injury Law, LLC submitted FOIA requests to the Occupational Safety and Health Administration for records concerning inspections of the ConMed Corporation located at Lithia Springs, Georgia. The agency produced 381 redacted records pertaining to two inspection reports. Moore Injury Law filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Moore Injury Law filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-211COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Moore Injury Law, LLC, Kevin G. Moore. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11669794) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3.1, # 4 Exhibit 3.2, # 5 Exhibit 3.3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5.1, # 8 Exhibit 5.2, # 9 Exhibit 5.3.1, # 10 Exhibit 5.3.2, # 11 Exhibit 5.3.3, # 12 Exhibit 5.3.4, # 13 Exhibit 5.3.5, # 14 Exhibit 6.1, # 15 Exhibit 6.2, # 16 Exhibit 7.1, # 17 Exhibit 7.2, # 18 Exhibit 8, # 19 Exhibit 9.1, # 20 Exhibit 9.2, # 21 Exhibit 9.3, # 22 Exhibit 9.4, # 23 Exhibit 9.5, # 24 Exhibit 10.1, # 25 Exhibit 10.2, # 26 Civil Cover Sheet)(cavc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2022: # 27 Corrected Main Document) (cavc). (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-212Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Summons OSHA West, # 2 Summons OSHA, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons United)(cavc) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-233STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/23/2022. (tmf) (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-04-184AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to US Department of Labor. (Hertz, Eric) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-255Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, with Brief In Support by United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Adam) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-256ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Department of Labor Answer due 5/27/2022. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/25/2022. (tmf) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-05-247Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: 1 Complaint,,, to file a responsive pleading with Brief In Support by United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Adam) Modified on 5/24/2022 to edit relief(tmf). (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-05-248ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, United States Department of Labor Answer due 7/26/2022. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/24/2022. (tmf) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar