Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBahrampour v. Department of the Army
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2022cv00710
Date Filed2022-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Deborah L. Boardman
PlaintiffAfshin Bahrampour
Case DescriptionAfshin Bahrampour submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning bio-effects of certain non-lethal weapons. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed a non-classified report from 2010. Dissatisfied with the agency's response, Bahrampour filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of the Army United States Army Intelligence and Security Command
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-231COMPLAINT against Department of the Army, filed by Afshin Bahrampour. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-04-042MOTION seeking service of process by Afshin Bahrampour (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Envelope)(bs4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/04/2022)
2022-04-043MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Afshin Bahrampour (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(bs4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/04/2022)
2022-04-084ORDER Granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Plaintiff 21 days to complete the U.S. Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/7/2022. (c/m 4/8/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-195Summons Issued 60 days as to Department of the Army, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-05-056SUMMONS Returned Executed by Afshin Bahrampour. Department of the Army served on 4/27/2022, answer due 6/27/2022.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar