Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLaROSE v. U.S. Department of Energy
DistrictNorthern District of West Virginia
CityMartinsburg
Case Number3:2022cv00046
Date Filed2022-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Gina M. Groh
PlaintiffShea LaROSE
Case DescriptionShea LaRose submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Energy for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but told LaRose's attorney that he needed to provide certification of authorization. After hearing nothing further from the agency, LaRose filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Energy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-211COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Energy, filed by Shea LaROSE. Filing Fee $402.00 - Receipt #AWVNDC-3446647. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Email, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwm) Modified: attachments 1 and 2 have been restricted per GMG Chambers (WB) on 3/28/2022 (cwm). (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-03-313NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan McKee (USA) on behalf of U.S. Department of Energy (McKee (USA), Morgan) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-314NOTICE of Appearance by Erin K. Reisenweber on behalf of U.S. Department of Energy (Reisenweber, Erin) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-04-135STIPULATION by U.S. Department of Energy. (Reisenweber, Erin) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar