Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION v. U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00889
Date Filed2022-04-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerican Accountability Foundation submitted 58 FOIA requests to U.S. Agency for Global Media for records concerning emails from specific individuals and subject relevant to Voice of America activity in the Middle East. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AAF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

Defendant2255
U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
300 Independence Ave, SW
Washington, DC 20237
DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-011COMPLAINT against U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9144759) filed by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Butcher, Jared) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-012MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Blake W. Meadows, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9144803. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Butcher, Jared) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-05Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-05NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to jared.butcher@crosscastle.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-053REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons US Attorney - DC, # 2 Summons Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons Summons for Defendant)(Butcher, Jared) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-064SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-06MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Blake W. Meadows is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/6/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-145NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Meadows on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Meadows, Blake) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA served on 4/12/2022 (Meadows, Blake) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/12/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/12/2022. (Meadows, Blake) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/12/2022. (Meadows, Blake) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-05-119NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of All Defendants (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-12MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/12/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar