Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00880
Date Filed2022-03-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerican Accountability Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning emails from specific individuals pertaining to Family Endeavors, which had obtained a contract to provide housing for migrants on the southern border. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AAF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES 22cv881
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-311COMPLAINT against AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9142730) filed by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burnham, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-312MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Blake W. Meadows, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9142736. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burnham, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-04-01Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-043STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 4, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 04/04/2022)
2022-04-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiff, upon consideration of plaintiff's 2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blake W. Meadows, to file a notice, by April 7, 2022, indicating the docket number(s) of the case(s) in which Mr. Meadows has been admitted pro hac vice in this Court within the last two years, as asserted in paragraph 5 of his [2-1] Declaration. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 7, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 04/04/2022)
2022-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Order of the Court due by 4/7/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-05SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (znmw) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-074NOTICE of Amended Declaration in Support of Pro Has Motion by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION re Order, (Burnham, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-08MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blake W. Meadows. Mr. Meadows may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 8, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08Cases Consolidated. Case 22-881 have been consolidated with case 22-880, pursuant to a Minute Order entered 4/8/2022. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead/earlier case, Civil Action No. 22-880.(zeg) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-145NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Meadows on behalf of AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION (Meadows, Blake) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-146REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION.(Meadows, Blake) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-197SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/22/2022 (Meadows, Blake) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-299RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 4/28/2022. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 5/19/2022. (Meadows, Blake) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar