Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleElectronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2022cv01957
Date Filed2022-03-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffElectronic Frontier Foundation
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Frontier Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning agreements with SRA International pursuant to the Visa Lifecycle Vetting Initiative. EFF also requested inclusion in the media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and transferred the request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-281COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief for Violation of Information Act against Department of Homeland Security (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17031924.). Filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rathi, Mukund) (Filed on 3/28/2022) Modified on 3/29/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-03-282Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022) (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-03-283Proposed Summons. (Rathi, Mukund) (Filed on 3/28/2022) (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-03-294Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Rathi, Mukund) (Filed on 3/29/2022) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-295NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron David Mackey (Mackey, Aaron) (Filed on 3/29/2022) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-296Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2022) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-297Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2022) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-04-078CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Rathi, Mukund) (Filed on 4/7/2022) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-079SUMMONS Returned Executed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/4/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. (Rathi, Mukund) (Filed on 4/7/2022) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-2910STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Mainardi, Andrew) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-2911CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Homeland Security.. (Mainardi, Andrew) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar