Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleERB v. YELLEN
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00856
Date Filed2022-03-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffDENNIS ERB
Case DescriptionDennis Erb submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning the agency's 2018 decision to suspend Erb's security clearance. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Erb filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantJANET YELLEN Secretary
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-301COMPLAINT against JANET YELLEN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9138351) filed by DENNIS ERB. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Watson, Jennie) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-03-31Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmh) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-31NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to cathryne.watson@leschtlaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-312REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DENNIS ERB. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Jennie) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JANET YELLEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjf) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-04-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2022. (Watson, Jennie) Modified on 4/7/2022 to reflect the correct date of service and the answer due date (jth). (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-225NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-256AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Watson, Jennie) Modified on 4/25/2022 to correct docket event/text. Document(s) mailed out via certified mail on 04/07/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-257AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. (Watson, Jennie) Modified on 4/25/2022 to correct docket event/text. Document(s) mailed out via certified mail on 04/07/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-268AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint mailed via certified mail as to United States Attorney General on 4/7/2022. (Watson, Jennie) Modified on 4/26/2022 to correct text (zjf). (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-269ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JANET YELLEN served on 4/12/2022 (Watson, Jennie) Modified on 4/26/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-26NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 9 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant. The following error(s) need correction: Document incomplete/illegible. Please refile. (zjf) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-2710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JANET YELLEN served on 4/12/2022 (Watson, Jennie) Modified on 4/28/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-2711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/12/2022. (Watson, Jennie) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-0312ANSWER to Complaint by JANET YELLEN.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-0913ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before June 6, 2022. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/09/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar