Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHETTENA v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00877
Date Filed2022-03-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffSETH HETTENA
Case DescriptionSeth Hettena, an investigative journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning the concluding document of the investigation of the Office of Inspector General into the death of Manadal al-Jamaidi. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hettena filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-311COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9142091) filed by SETH HETTENA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-312NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of SETH HETTENA (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-313NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of SETH HETTENA (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-04-01Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-054SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-05-135NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-136Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-13MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by June 14, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/13/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/14/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar