Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLegal Aid Justice Center v. U.S. Department of Labor
DistrictWestern District of Virginia
CityCharlottesville
Case Number3:2022cv00013
Date Filed2022-03-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Norman K. Moon
PlaintiffLegal Aid Justice Center
Case DescriptionThe Legal Aid Justice Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning information about how the agency makes determinations of contract impossibility under the H-2A guest worker program. LAJC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency located 142 pages but only disclosed 22 pages, citing Exemption 5 (privilege). LAJC filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, LAJC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-301COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Labor (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-3920348.), filed by Legal Aid Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)
2022-03-302Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued, # 2 Summons Issued)(dg)
2022-03-303Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Legal Aid Justice Center (dg)
2022-04-054NOTICE by Legal Aid Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, USAO Executed Summons and Proof of Service)(Baer, Marissa)
2022-04-055NOTICE by Legal Aid Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, DOL Executed Summons and Proof of Service)(Baer, Marissa)
2022-04-126NOTICE by Legal Aid Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, DOJ Executed Summons and Proof of Service)(Baer, Marissa)
2022-04-267Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bugbee, Sara)
2022-04-268ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading, for the reasons set forth therein and finding good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. Dkt. 7. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 17, 2022. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 04/26/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (dg)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar