Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00845
Date Filed2022-03-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed journalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning all reports prepared by or for the Office of Net Assessment from January 2017 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Leopold that it had a backlog of 3,713 open requests and that his request would be processed in turn. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9135699) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-3, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-292NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-293LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-294NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-30Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmg) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-03-305SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(ztth) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-04-186NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-05-117ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before May 25, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5-11-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-258Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to file another joint status report on or before September 29, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5-25-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar