Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-03-30 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Administration, filed by Paul Lietz.(kmp) |
2022-03-30 | | RECEIPT: Check Fee Received $ 402, receipt # 29522 (kmp) |
2022-03-30 | 2 | Summons Issued as to Drug Enforcement Administration. (Print attached Summons for service.) (kmp) |
2022-05-23 | 3 | SUBPOENA/USM 285 RETURNED EXECUTED as to Drug Enforcement Administration served on 5/3/2022. (jd) |
2022-06-03 | 4 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Woychick, Nicholas) |
2022-06-06 | 5 | NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Drug Enforcement Administration and to Paul Lietz re 1 Complaint and 4 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/5/2022. (jd) |
2022-06-17 | 6 | A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE (lm) |
2023-01-06 | 7 | MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 1/27/2023)Nicholas J Woychick appearing for Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Woychick, Nicholas) |
2023-01-09 | 8 | NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (jd) |
2023-02-24 | 9 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Paul Lietz. Responses due by 3/17/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)(jd) |
2023-03-02 | 10 | RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Drug Enforcement Administration. Replies due by 3/16/2023.(Woychick, Nicholas) |
2023-03-08 | 11 | Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Paul Lietz. Replies due by 3/22/2023.(jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2023: # 1 Certificate of Service) (jd). |
2023-03-13 | 12 | Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Paul Lietz.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/14/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Service, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Service)(jd) |
2023-03-16 | 13 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Drug Enforcement Administration.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/17/2023.(Woychick, Nicholas) |
2023-06-05 | 14 | DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE AND NOTICE OF CASE NUMBER CHANGE. Due to the appointment of United States District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford. Judge David C. Nye is no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 1:22-cv-136-AKB on all future pleadings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km) |
2023-08-21 | 15 | LITIGATION ORDER - On or before September 20, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) |
2023-08-21 | 16 | MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Lietzs Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. [9-1]) is GRANTED; and Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 7 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) |
2023-08-24 | 17 | MOTION Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration's Motion to Modify Litigation Order re 15 Litigation Order, Nicholas J Woychick appearing for Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration. Responses due by 9/14/2023 (Woychick, Nicholas) |
2023-08-28 | 18 | AMENDED LITIGATION ORDER - On or before September 20, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) |
2023-09-06 | 19 | NOTICE to the Court re: MDO 16 by Paul Lietz. (jd) |
2023-09-14 | 20 | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Paul Lietz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Litigation Plan, # 2 Proposed Discovery Plan)(jd) |
2023-09-14 | 21 | MOTION to Stay re 18 Litigation Order, Nicholas J Woychick appearing for Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration. Responses due by 10/5/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Woychick Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Woychick, Nicholas) |
2023-09-18 | 22 | ERRATA by Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration re 21 MOTION to Stay re 18 Litigation Order, Declaration and Amended Exhibits . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Woychick, Nicholas) |
2023-09-25 | 23 | Plaintiff's Non-Consent re: service by Paul Lietz. (jd) |
Hide Docket Events |