Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-03-31 | 1 | COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9140034) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA #57539, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons - US Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Agency General Counsel)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 03/31/2022) |
2022-03-31 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 03/31/2022) |
2022-03-31 | 2 | ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/31/2022. (DM) (Entered: 03/31/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2022: # 1 Notice and Consent) (znmw). (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-05-03 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/03/2022) |
2022-06-01 | 5 | MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/01/2022) |
2022-06-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file its opposition on or before June 15, 2022 and Defendant shall file its reply on or before June 22, 2022 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 1, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/01/2022) |
2022-06-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to 5 due by 6/15/2022. Defendant's Reply to 5 due by 6/22/2022. (dot) (Entered: 06/02/2022) |
2022-06-14 | 6 | RESPONSE re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 06/14/2022) |
2022-06-21 | 7 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/21/2022) |
2022-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition. Counsel for Defendant represents that she requires additional time to confer with agency counsel in advance of filing a reply in support of Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant requests an extension from June 22, 2022 to July 6, 2022 to file such a reply. As Plaintiff consents, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition is GRANTED . Defendant shall file its reply in support of its 5 Motion to Dismiss on or before July 6, 2022 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 22, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/22/2022) |
2022-06-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply to 5 due by 7/6/2022. (dot) (Entered: 06/22/2022) |
2022-07-06 | 8 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 Response to motion filed by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/06/2022) |
2023-07-12 | 9 | NOTICE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 10 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2024-02-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs the parties to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2024 . Therein, the parties shall briefly state their respective positions on the pending 5 Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall also raise any new persuasive or binding case law for the Court's review. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/26/2024. (lcckk1) (Entered: 02/26/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |