Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleE.G.V. v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2022cv00407
Date Filed2022-03-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Janis L. Sammartino
PlaintiffE.G.V.
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [20]
Opinion/Order [23]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-03-281COMPLAINT Against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16687968.), filed by E.G.V. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:22-cv-407-JLS-RBB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Anne Peterson)(cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-03-282Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-03-283SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by E.G.V. re 1 Complaint, Exhibits . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Peterson, Anne) QC mailer sent re: exhibits need to be attached to the complaint when it is filed (tcf). (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-03-284MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Peterson, Anne) (fth). (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-03-285SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 4 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Peterson, Anne) (fth). (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-04-056ORDER granting 4 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym and File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/5/2022. (fth) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-288SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.G.V. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served. (Peterson, Anne) (tcf). (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-289SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by E.G.V. re 8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA for CASD AUSA and U.S. Atty. Gen. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Peterson, Anne) (tcf). (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-05-0610Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline)Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-0911ORDER Granting 10 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement SHALL FILE its responsive pleading on or before 6/10/2022. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/9/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-06-0712Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (tcf). (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-0813ORDER Granting 12 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement SHALL FILE its responsive pleading on or before 7/11/2022. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/8/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-07-1114Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (tcf). (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-1115ORDER Granting 14 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement SHALL FILE its responsive pleading on or before 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/11/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-08-0116Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (tcf). (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-0217ORDER Granting 16 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Defendant SHALL FILE its responsive pleading on or before 9/2/2022. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/2/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-09-0218Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (alns). (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-1619ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (tcf). (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-1920ORDER Denying as Moot 18 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/19/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-2021NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are set for 11/16/2022 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks via Zoom videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 9/20/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-11-0322MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Annie Daher by E.G.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In support of Motion to Withdraw)(Daher, Anne) (tcf). (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-0323ORDER Granting 22 Application to Withdraw Anne Daher as Counsel of Record for the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/3/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-1624Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference held. (Plaintiff Attorneys Anne Peterson, Zohaile Kakavand). (Defendant Attorney Caroline C. Prime). The parties shall submit a joint status report by email to efile_brooks@casd.uscourts.gov by January 17, 2023. (no document attached) (cdc) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar