Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJames C. Henry v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictCentral District of California
CityEastern Division - Riverside
Case Number5:2022cv00580
Date Filed2022-04-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sheri Pym
PlaintiffJames C. Henry
Case DescriptionJames Henry filed a FOIA request with the IRS for records concerning documents related to him by name or taxpayer identification number. The IRS acknowledged receipt of the request but denied it in full. Henry filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld its original decision and told Henry the records were exemption under Section 6103. Henry then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-051COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33072574 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff John C Henry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Robert E. Barnes added to party John C Henry(pty:pla))(Barnes, Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-062NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: # 1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-063NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 5 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-05-104Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by plaintiff James C. Henry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit IRS summons, # 2 Exhibit US Atty summons)(Barnes, Robert) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-115NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 4 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. Note complete case number: EDCV 22-00580 SP. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-116Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request 4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, 5 filed by plaintiff James C. Henry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons to US Attorney CD CA)(Barnes, Robert) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-12760 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 US Attorney)(es) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-05-128[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED 5/13/2022 SEE DKT. 9 DOCKETED ON WRONG CASE] REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Dismissal) (es) Modified on 5/13/2022 (es). (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-05-139NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE)(AO 121) 8 was issued on the incorrect case. The correct case should be: SACV 22-237-JVS (es) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar