Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleARRINGTON v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00928
Date Filed2022-04-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffKATHERINE ARRINGTON
Case DescriptionKatherine Arrington, a senior executive service employee at the Department of Defense starting in 2019 until she resigned to run for Congress in 2022, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning the suspension of her security clearance by the National Security Agency in 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of her request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Arrington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-051COMPLAINT against KATHERINE ARRINGTON ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9151838) filed by KATHERINE ARRINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons - DoD, # 3 Summons Summons - AG, # 4 Summons Summons - USAO DC, # 5 Related Case Form Notice of Related Case)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-052SEALED DOCUMENT filed by KATHERINE ARRINGTON re 1 Complaint, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-053NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KATHERINE ARRINGTON. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-02669-JEB. (zmh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/12/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Tracking USAO DC)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-05-126NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-05-127ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-05-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by May 26, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/12/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar