Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOS ALAMOS STUDY GROUP v. NATIONAL NUCLEAR SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00935
Date Filed2022-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffLOS ALAMOS STUDY GROUP
Case DescriptionThe Los Alamos Study Group submitted 16 FOIA requests to the National Nuclear Security Administration for a number of topics, including records concerning performance evaluation reports for 2019-2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Los Alamos Group filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL NUCLEAR SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-061COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9153410) filed by LOS ALAMOS STUDY GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Stills, Travis) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LOS ALAMOS STUDY GROUP (Stills, Travis) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-07Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (znmg) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL NUCLEAR SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-074STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 4/7/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/19/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/19/2022. (Stills, Travis) Modified on 4/21/2022 to correct serve/answer due date(s) (zjf). (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-21NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to stills@eclawoffice.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed , 2. Refile same document as to the Issuance to the AG & Federal Dft (zjf, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL NUCLEAR SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 4/18/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/19/2022. (Stills, Travis) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-05-197NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of NATIONAL NUCLEAR SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-198ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL NUCLEAR SECURITY ADMINISTRATION.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-209ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report proposing a schedule for litigation of this case on or before June 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/20/2022. (lcsw) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar