Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00940
Date Filed2022-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel for records concerning the February 11, 2022 Executive Order related to the decision to freeze, consolidate, and potentially distribute Afghan funds. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the ACLU's request for expedited processing, deferred a decision on its fee waiver request, and indicated that request would be placed in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-061COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-9154579) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons for Department of Justice, # 4 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons for U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-063LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-064MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sarah Taitz, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9155035. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah Taitz, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-07Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmg) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-075SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/14/2022 (Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-17NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to bkaufman@aclu.org, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Proof of delivery is required; refile Return of Service using delivery date as date of service, 2. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed , 3. As to the USAG & US Attorney for DC (zjf, ) (Entered: 04/17/2022)
2022-04-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/14/2022. (Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/14/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/14/2022. (Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-289AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION.(Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-2910ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 9 Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. Related document: 9 Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION.(Kaufman, Brett) Modified on 4/29/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-1111ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1312NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Taitz on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Taitz, Sarah) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-1613NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-1614ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-1715ORDER: Meet & Confer Statement due by 6/2/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/17/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar