Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEVANS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00942
Date Filed2022-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffBILLY WAYNE EVANS, JR.
Case DescriptionBilly Wayne Evans submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning himself and his deceased father. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency told Evans that it found no records in response to both requests. Evans filed administrative appeals for both requests. The agency upheld the denials for both requests. Evans then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-061COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9155112) filed by BILLY WAYNE EVANS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons FBI, # 13 Summons USAG, # 14 Summons USAO)(Sorenson, C.) (Attachment 11 replaced on 4/7/2022) (znmg). Modified on 4/7/2022 to replace fillable civil cover sheet (znmg). (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-07NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to petesorenson@gmail.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. Civil Cover Sheet filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format using the event Civil Cover Sheet. (znmg, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-083ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet by BILLY WAYNE EVANS, JR re Notice of QC- New Case,,. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-11Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-114SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-05-175ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-196STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 19, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-19MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before June 17, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated dates for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's requests can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 19, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-257RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2022. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar