Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFrost v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv02858
Date Filed2022-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Laura Taylor Swain
PlaintiffVinton P. Frost
Case DescriptionVinton Frost submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning himself and his detention by the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Frost filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [6]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-061REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-062COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (sac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2022: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sac). (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-06Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-063PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Vinton P. Frost consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-064NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-19NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-205ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/20/2022) (vn) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-05-026ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within 60 days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 22-CV-2858 (LTS). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/2/2022) (sac) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-127NOTICE re: filing of FOIA request to U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security on 5/1122. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(sc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar