Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00945
Date Filed2022-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning the movie "Mayor Pete" and including a list of keywords for searching. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told PPT that it was processing the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-071COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9155974) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA OST-2022-0097, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Department of Transportation General Counsel)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-07Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zsb) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-073STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 4/7/2022. (lcsw) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-05-204NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-205ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-246ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report proposing a schedule for litigation of this case on or before June 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/24/2022. (lcrl) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-05-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/10/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar