Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00948
Date Filed2022-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture's Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records sent to or from APHIS veterinarian Albert Kane discussing or describing the BLM's Wild Horse and Burro Program from June 15, 2021 to September 15, 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided AWHC with a two-page response. AWHC then filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9156968) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USDA Summons, # 3 Summons USAO DC Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-07Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-05-043NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-094ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-09MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 6/21/22. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/9/22. (DJS) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2022. (tb) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar