Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00959
Date Filed2022-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionProfessional Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the Interim Oil and Gas Report and all communications related to the release and all background materials for the report. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency released the interim report on its website but did not disclose any of the background materials. The agency then released some background materials and told PEER it would release them on a rolling basis. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-071COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9158050) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for DOI, # 3 Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons for US Att DC)(Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-11Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-113STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 11, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-144SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-05-205NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-206Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-20MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before June 8, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 20, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar