Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv02885
Date Filed2022-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J. Paul Oetken
PlaintiffKathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law
PlaintiffEnvision Freedom Fund
Case DescriptionThe Kathryn Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the immigration bond system. The law clinic also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The law clinic also requested records in a spreadsheet format. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law clinic filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-071COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25976797)Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law, ENVISION FREEDOM FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit ICE Acknowledgment).(Norona, Mauricio) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-072CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Norona, Mauricio) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-073RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ENVISION FREEDOM FUND, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-074FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by ENVISION FREEDOM FUND, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio) Modified on 4/8/2022 (pc). (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-075FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by ENVISION FREEDOM FUND, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio) Modified on 4/8/2022 (pc). (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-086NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter L. Markowitz on behalf of ENVISION FREEDOM FUND, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mauricio Eduardo Norona. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ENVISION FREEDOM FUND. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mauricio Eduardo Norona to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Remove "Ruby J. Krajick" from "Clerk of Court". Place " U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement" in front of "Office of the General Counsel";. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-087REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-088REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-119ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (vf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-1110ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (vf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-1511NOTICE of Motion for Leave to Appear as Law Students. Document filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Aaron Friedman Law Student Intern Appearance Form, # 2 Exhibit Mary Karapogosian Law Student Intern Appearance Form, # 3 Exhibit Calli Schmitt Law Student Intern Appearance Form).(Norona, Mauricio) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-1812MEMO ENDORSEMENT on LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM of Calli Schmitt on re: 11 Notice (Other), filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law. ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/18/2022) (ate) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-1813MEMO ENDORSEMENT on LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM of Mary Karapogosian on re: 11 Notice (Other), filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/18/2022) (ate) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-1814MEMO ENDORSEMENT on LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM of Aaron Friedman on re: 11 Notice (Other), filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law. ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/18/2022) (ate) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-05-0215AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/16/2022; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law; Envision Freedom Fund..(Norona, Mauricio) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-1616ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Onozawa, Tomoko) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-1717ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 24, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Initial Conference set for 6/24/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/17/2022) (ate) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar