Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEmery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP v. United States Customs and Border Protection
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv02891
Date Filed2022-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffEmery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Board Protection for records concerning the death of Hernandez Vasquez while in agency detention. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency initially withheld the records under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). After the Office of Inspector General investigation was completed, the agency abandoned the exemption. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Choice of format, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-071COMPLAINT against United States Customs and Border Protection. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25977973)Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B- CBP Letter, # 3 Exhibit C- Plaintiff's Letter, # 4 Exhibit D- Second Request Confirmation).(Rosenfeld, Katherine) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-072CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenfeld, Katherine) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-073REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Rosenfeld, Katherine) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-08***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Katherine R. Rosenfeld, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-08CASE REFERRED TO Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald as possibly related to 22cv873. (pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-084ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Customs and Border Protection..(pc) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-085NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ananda Venkata Burra on behalf of Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Burra, Ananda) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-086STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-0873 (NRB). Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Burra, Ananda) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-15CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-00873-NRB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-15NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-15Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (aea) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-277AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on United States Customs and Border Protection on 04/13/2022. Service was accepted by Derrick Mayers. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Rosenfeld, Katherine) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-278CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on United States Customs and Border Protection on 4/21/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Rosenfeld, Katherine) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-099NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection..(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-1310ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Customs and Border Protection..(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar