Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-04-08 | 1 | COMPLAINT against AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9160978) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Summons USADC, # 18 Summons USAG, # 19 Summons CDC, # 20 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Rubinstein, Reed) (Entered: 04/08/2022) |
2022-04-11 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to reed.rubinstein@aflegal.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing signature on civil cover sheet. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name'., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-04-11 | 2 | ERRATA Cover Sheet by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION re 1 Complaint,, filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Rubinstein, Reed) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-04-11 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmh) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-04-11 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-05-17 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Sanderson on behalf of AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Sanderson, Tyler) (Entered: 05/17/2022) |
2022-05-18 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2022) |
2022-05-18 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2022) |
2022-05-19 | 7 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before June 1, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion to stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/19/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/19/2022) |
2022-06-01 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2022) |
2022-06-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 2, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. The court declines Plaintiff's request to require Defendant to process 1,000 pages per month. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/2/20222. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/02/2022) |
2022-06-09 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2022. (Sanderson, Tyler) (Entered: 06/09/2022) |
2022-06-09 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 4/15/2022 (Sanderson, Tyler) (Entered: 06/09/2022) |
2022-06-09 | 11 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/14/2022. (Sanderson, Tyler) (Entered: 06/09/2022) |
2022-08-02 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-08-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 3, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/2/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by December 2, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. The court will not set a deadline for consulting agencies to respond at this time. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/3/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-12-02 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 12/02/2022) |
2022-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by February 3, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/5/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2023-01-25 | 15 | NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Block on behalf of AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Block, Andrew) (Main Document 15 replaced on 1/29/2023) (zed). (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-27 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-27 | 17 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. Attorney Tyler Sanderson terminated. (Sanderson, Tyler) Modified docket event/text on 1/29/2023 (zed). (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 28, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/30/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-03-28 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 03/28/2023) |
2023-03-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 31, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/29/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/29/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-06-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 29, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/01/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-06-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 31, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/30/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-08-31 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/31/2023) |
2023-09-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 3, 2023, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/01/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/01/2023) |
2023-11-03 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/03/2023) |
2023-11-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by February 29, 2024, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/6/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2024-02-29 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 02/29/2024) |
2024-03-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 28, 2024, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/01/2024. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/01/2024) |
2024-03-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2024. (hmc) (Entered: 03/01/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |