Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT SOUTH: THE INSTITUTE FOR THE ELIMINATION OF POVERTY AND GENOCIDE v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00979
Date Filed2022-04-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPROJECT SOUTH: THE INSTITUTE FOR THE ELIMINATION OF POVERTY AND GENOCIDE
Case DescriptionProject South submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's standards of operation for the Stewart Detention Center, including standards for medical care and COVID-19 protocols. Project South also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Project South filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-081COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9161011) filed by PROJECT SOUTH: THE INSTITUTE FOR THE ELIMINATION OF POVERTY AND GENOCIDE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons ICE, # 3 Summons DHS, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons US Attorney)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT SOUTH: THE INSTITUTE FOR THE ELIMINATION OF POVERTY AND GENOCIDE (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmh) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-114STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/11/2022. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-135MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Irene R. Lax, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9169918. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROJECT SOUTH: THE INSTITUTE FOR THE ELIMINATION OF POVERTY AND GENOCIDE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-13Minute Order: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. 5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Irene R. Lax is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click here for instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/13/2022. (lcrdm3) Modified link on 6/24/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-05-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/19/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/19/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/18/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/2/22. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-06-227NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-06-228Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-06-239NOTICE of Appearance by Irene Lax on behalf of PROJECT SOUTH: THE INSTITUTE FOR THE ELIMINATION OF POVERTY AND GENOCIDE (Lax, Irene) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
2022-06-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion for extension, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before July 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 06/24/2022. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 06/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar