Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00938
Date Filed2022-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffVANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case DescriptionVanda Pharmaceutical submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning the agency's reviews of its new drug application for Hetlioz. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Vanda Pharmaceutical that it would withhold the reviews under Exemption 5 (privileges). Vanda Pharmaceutical filed an administrative an administrative appeal to the Department of Health and Human Services. More than a year later, HHS upheld the FDA's decision. Vanda Pharmaceutical then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-061COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9153650) filed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-07Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-113SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/11/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/11/2022. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-05-115ANSWER to Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-116NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-12MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 27, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/12/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar