Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePutnam v. The United States Army Review Board Agency et al
DistrictWestern District of Oklahoma
CityOklahoma City
Case Number5:2022cv00305
Date Filed2022-04-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robin J. Cauthron
PlaintiffLt. Col (Ret) Joe A Putnam
10608 Wallnut Hollow Drive
Oklahoma City, OK 73162
(405)721-7127
Case DescriptionJoe Putnam, a retired Army Lt. Col., submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army Review Board for records concerning his case. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Putnam filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe United States Army Review Board Agency
DefendantThe Honorable Wormuth in her official capacity as The Secretary of the Army
DefendantThe Honorable Alexander Conyers in his official capacity as The Deputy Assistant Secretary of The Army for Review Boards
DefendantThe United States Department of the Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-081COMPLAINT against Alexander Conyers, The United States Army Review Board Agency, The United States Department of the Army, Wormuth filed by Joe A Putnam. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-12PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BOKWDC-3887246. (Kemper, Kevin) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-05-202Summons Issued Electronically as to Alexander Conyers, The United States Army Review Board Agency, The United States Department of the Army, Wormuth. (dtb) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-243ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin R Kemper on behalf of Joe A Putnam (Kemper, Kevin) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar